PA HB1098 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-26 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-09-26 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 31, 1965 (P.L.1257, No.511), known as The Local Tax Enabling Act, in local taxes, further providing for delegation of taxing powers and restrictions thereon; and, in consolidated collection of local income taxes, further providing for declaration and payment of income taxes.
Title
In local taxes, further providing for delegation of taxing powers and restrictions thereon; and, in consolidated collection of local income taxes, further providing for declaration and payment of income taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-23 - House - House Finance: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A05255 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Local Government: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A05255 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - House - House Local Government: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-26 | House | Removed from table |
2018-09-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-06-05 | House | Removed from table |
2018-06-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-03-13 | House | Removed from table |
2018-01-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-01-23 | House | First consideration |
2018-01-23 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-06-28 | House | Re-referred to FINANCE |
2017-06-28 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to FINANCE |
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |