PA HB1098 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-08 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-08 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 28, 1984 (P.L.150, No.28), known as the Automobile Lemon Law, further providing for the definition of "new motor vehicle."
Title
Further providing for the definition of "new motor vehicle."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-21 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-21 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-21 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-12-17 | House | Removed from table |
2015-12-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-11-30 | House | Removed from table |
2015-11-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-10-26 | House | Removed from table |
2015-10-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-07-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-24 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2015-06-24 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-05-04 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |