PA HB1097 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-6)
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-10-31 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in terms and courses of study, providing for CPR instruction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In terms and courses of study, providing for CPR instruction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1097 PN 4270, FP (Y: 116 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1097 PN 3743, 2017 A10342, SUSP RULES, MCCARTER (Y: 73 N: 116 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-10-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1097 PN 3743, 2017 A7827, JAMES (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A07650 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-31SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2018-10-17SenateIn the Senate
2018-10-17HouseThird consideration and final passage (116-71)
2018-10-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-10-16HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-10-16HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-10-15HouseRemoved from table
2018-09-12HouseLaid on the table
2018-09-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-19HouseRe-committed to RULES
2018-06-19HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-19HouseReported as amended
2017-04-07HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1097
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1097&pn=1291
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1097&pn=3743
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1097&pn=4270
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=06/19/2018&RollCallId=1685
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=06/19/2018&RollCallId=1686
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1567
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1568
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/17/2018&RollCallId=2073
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1604

Bill Comments

feedback