PA HB1096 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in human trafficking, further providing for civil causes of action.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In human trafficking, further providing for civil causes of action.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1096 PN 1128, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-06SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2022-01-19SenateFirst consideration
2022-01-19SenateReported as committed
2021-05-28SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2021-05-25SenateIn the Senate
2021-05-25HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-05-25HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-05-24HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-05-24HouseSecond consideration
2021-05-05HouseRemoved from table
2021-04-20HouseLaid on the table
2021-04-20HouseFirst consideration
2021-04-20HouseReported as committed
2021-04-05HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback