PA HB1095 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in sentencing, further providing for life imprisonment for homicide.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In sentencing, further providing for life imprisonment for homicide.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 1095 PN 1127, FP (Y: 123 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2021-06-08SenateIn the Senate
2021-06-08HouseThird consideration and final passage (123-80)
2021-06-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-06-07HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-07HouseSecond consideration
2021-05-26HouseRemoved from table
2021-05-25HouseLaid on the table
2021-05-25HouseFirst consideration
2021-05-25HouseReported as committed
2021-04-05HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback