PA HB1095 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-09-29 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act requiring identification of lawful presence in the United States as a prerequisite to the receipt of public benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring identification of lawful presence in the United States as a prerequisite to the receipt of public benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1095 PN 1357, FP (Y: 139 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1095 PN 1357, 2017 A3325, FRANKEL (Y: 89 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1095 PN 1357, 2017 A3309, MCCARTER (Y: 77 N: 114 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1095 PN 1357, 2017 A3294, RABB (Y: 74 N: 117 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1095 PN 1357, 2017 A3290, DEAN (Y: 73 N: 118 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1095 PN 1357, 2017 A3284, DEAN (Y: 66 N: 125 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1095 PN 1357, 2017 A3295, BRADFORD (Y: 71 N: 120 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1095 PN 1357, 2017 A3287, BRADFORD (Y: 74 N: 117 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1095 PN 1357, 2017 A1408, BRADFORD (Y: 69 N: 122 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2017-06-07 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-29SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2017-09-26SenateIn the Senate
2017-09-26HouseThird consideration and final passage (139-58)
2017-09-26HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-09-25HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-09-25HouseSecond consideration
2017-09-11HouseRemoved from table
2017-09-08HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-07HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-07HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-07HouseReported as committed
2017-04-12HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1095
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1095&pn=1357
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=06/07/2017&RollCallId=500
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=689
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=690
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=691
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=692
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=693
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=694
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=695
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=696
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=707
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=09/26/2017&RollCallId=922

Bill Comments

feedback