PA HB1091 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-12)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating the entire portion of US Route 20 in Pennsylvania, beginning at the Pennsylvania-Ohio State Line and ending at the Pennsylvania-New York State Line, as the Pennsylvania Medal of Honor Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating the entire portion of US Route 20 in Pennsylvania, beginning at the Pennsylvania-Ohio State Line and ending at the Pennsylvania-New York State Line, as the Pennsylvania Medal of Honor Highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 1091 PN 1125, FP (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2021-06-08SenateIn the Senate
2021-06-08HouseThird consideration and final passage (203-0)
2021-06-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-06-07HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-07HouseSecond consideration
2021-05-26HouseRemoved from table
2021-05-24HouseLaid on the table
2021-05-24HouseFirst consideration
2021-05-24HouseReported as committed
2021-04-05HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback