PA HB1082 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on February 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-09 - Act No. 9 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on February 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-09 - Act No. 9 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, in ARPA health care workforce supports, further providing for definitions; and providing for early detection and diagnosis of Alzheimer's Disease or a related disorder.
Title
In ARPA health care workforce supports, further providing for definitions; and providing for early detection and diagnosis of Alzheimer's Disease or a related disorder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Floor: HB 1082 PN 2714, CONCUR (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1082 PN 2714, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1082 PN 1830, FP (Y: 201 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1082 PN 1743, 2021 A1641, HENNESSEY (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A01526 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Floor: HB 1082 PN 2714, CONCUR (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1082 PN 2714, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-22 - Senate - Senate Aging And Youth: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1082 PN 1830, FP (Y: 201 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1082 PN 1743, 2021 A1641, HENNESSEY (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A01526 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | House | Act No. 9 of 2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-02-09 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-02-08 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-02-08 | House | Signed in House |
2022-02-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (200-0) |
2022-02-08 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred to RULES |
2022-02-07 | House | In the House |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Removed from table |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-09-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-09-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Referred to AGING AND YOUTH |
2021-06-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-06-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-1) |
2021-06-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-15 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2021-06-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-09 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-09 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-09 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-04-19 | House | Referred to HEALTH |