PA HB1081 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act repealing the act of June 22 1931 (P.L.685, No.250), entitled "An act providing for the settlement of capital stock tax in the cases of corporations, joint-stock associations, limited partnerships, and companies which own assets which are exempted or relieved from capital stock tax."
Title
Repealing the act of June 22 1931 (P.L.685, No.250), entitled "An act providing for the settlement of capital stock tax in the cases of corporations, joint-stock associations, limited partnerships, and companies which own assets which are exempted or relieved from capital stock tax."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1081 PN 1255, FP (Y: 189 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2019-05-01 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-05-01 | House | Third consideration and final passage (189-1) |
2019-05-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-04-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-04-30 | House | Second consideration |
2019-04-29 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-17 | House | First consideration |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to FINANCE |