PA HB1081 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-04-09 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Summary

An Act amending the act of July 10, 1990 (P.L.404, No.98), known as the Real Estate Appraisers Certification Act, further providing for State Board of Certified Real Estate Appraisers, for disciplinary and corrective measures and for penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act amending the act of July 10, 1990 (P.L.404, No.98), known as the Real Estate Appraisers Certification Act, further providing for State Board of Certified Real Estate Appraisers, for disciplinary and corrective measures and for penalties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2008-04-09 Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2008-04-08 Final passage
2008-04-08 Vote on final passage reconsidered
2008-04-08 Third consideration and final passage
2008-04-07 Second consideration
2008-04-07 Re-reported as committed
2008-02-13 Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2008-02-13 Removed from table
2008-02-12 Laid on the table
2008-02-12 First consideration
2008-02-12 Reported as amended
2007-04-18 Referred to COMMERCE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback