PA HB108 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 32-10)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating Exit 18 of State Route 43, known as the Searights Road interchange, in Fayette County as the Staff Sgt. John P. Wanto Vietnam Veteran Exit.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating Exit 18 of State Route 43, known as the Searights Road interchange, in Fayette County as the Staff Sgt. John P. Wanto Vietnam Veteran Exit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 108 PN 1678, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00946 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-08SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2017-06-05SenateIn the Senate
2017-06-05HouseThird consideration and final passage (195-0)
2017-06-05HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-05-24HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-05-24HouseSecond consideration
2017-05-23HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-08HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-08HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-08HouseReported as amended
2017-01-23HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=108
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0108&pn=0085
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0108&pn=1678
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=05/08/2017&RollCallId=339
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=05/08/2017&RollCallId=338
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=401
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/05/2017&RollCallId=485

Bill Comments

feedback