PA HB1074 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-14 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in municipal authorities, providing for governing bodies of airport authorities located in counties of the second class.
Title
In municipal authorities, providing for governing bodies of airport authorities located in counties of the second class.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1074 PN 1614, 2019 A929, CUTLER (Y: 175 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1074 PN 1614, 2019 A928, B. MILLER (Y: 173 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1074 PN 1614, 2019 A907, GAYDOS (Y: 161 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1074 PN 1614, 2019 A939, RYAN (Y: 103 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1074 PN 1614, 2019 A946, HANBIDGE (Y: 174 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00796 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00794 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00793 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00797 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1074 PN 1614, 2019 A928, B. MILLER (Y: 173 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1074 PN 1614, 2019 A907, GAYDOS (Y: 161 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1074 PN 1614, 2019 A939, RYAN (Y: 103 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1074 PN 1614, 2019 A946, HANBIDGE (Y: 174 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00796 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00794 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00793 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00797 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-18 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-07 | House | Removed from table |
2020-04-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-12-18 | House | Removed from table |
2019-12-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-25 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-12 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-30 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-29 | House | First consideration |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |