PA HB1074 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in municipal authorities, providing for governing bodies of airport authorities located in counties of the second class.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In municipal authorities, providing for governing bodies of airport authorities located in counties of the second class.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1074 PN 1614, 2019 A929, CUTLER (Y: 175 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1074 PN 1614, 2019 A928, B. MILLER (Y: 173 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1074 PN 1614, 2019 A907, GAYDOS (Y: 161 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1074 PN 1614, 2019 A939, RYAN (Y: 103 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1074 PN 1614, 2019 A946, HANBIDGE (Y: 174 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00796 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00794 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00793 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00797 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12HouseRemoved from table
2019-06-12HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-30HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-29HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-29HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-29HouseReported as amended
2019-04-05HouseReferred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1074
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1074&pn=1234
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1074&pn=1614
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=04/29/2019&RollCallId=369
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=04/29/2019&RollCallId=368
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=04/29/2019&RollCallId=370
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=04/29/2019&RollCallId=371
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=30&theDate=04/29/2019&RollCallId=372
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=232
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=233
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=234
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=235
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=236

Bill Comments

feedback