PA HB1071 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Veto No. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Veto No. 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in other subjects of taxation, prohibiting bans, fees, surcharges and taxes on recyclable plastic bags.
Title
In other subjects of taxation, prohibiting bans, fees, surcharges and taxes on recyclable plastic bags.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Farry [R] | Rep. Michael Hanna [D] | Rep. Christopher Harris [R] | Rep. David Millard [R] |
Rep. Robert Godshall [R] | Rep. Stephen Barrar [R] | Rep. Seth Grove [R] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1071 PN 1270, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1071 PN 1270, FP (Y: 102 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1071 PN 1270, FP (Y: 102 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | Senate | Veto No. 1 |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Signed in House |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (28-21) |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Second consideration |
2017-06-05 | Senate | First consideration |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2017-04-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-04-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (102-87) |
2017-04-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-04-24 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-04-24 | House | Second consideration |
2017-04-19 | House | Removed from table |
2017-04-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-04-18 | House | First consideration |
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |