PA HB107 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-10-01 - Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 4133
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 66 (Public Utilities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in rates and distribution systems, providing for recovery of natural gas distribution system extension costs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In rates and distribution systems, providing for recovery of natural gas distribution system extension costs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 107 PN 3775, 2017 A8738, SCHWEYER (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 107 PN 3775, 2017 A8734, MADDEN (Y: 79 N: 116 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2018-06-22 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A07830 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-01HouseCorrective Reprint, Printer's No. 4133
2018-09-25HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-09-25HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-06-22HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-20HouseRe-committed to RULES
2018-06-20HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-20HouseReported as amended
2017-01-23HouseReferred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=107
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0107&pn=0084
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0107&pn=3775
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0107&pn=4078
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0107&pn=4133
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=10&theDate=06/20/2018&RollCallId=1772
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=10&theDate=06/20/2018&RollCallId=1777
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/22/2018&RollCallId=1829
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1465
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1466

Bill Comments

feedback