PA HB107 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-09 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-09 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 62 (Procurement) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for competitive sealed proposals.
Title
Further providing for competitive sealed proposals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-08 - House - HB 107 PN 59, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - HB 107 PN 59, 2011 A196, MOT GERMANE, DUNBAR (Y: 87 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2011-01-31 - House - HB 107 PN 59, 2011 A198, MOT GERMANE, DUNBAR (Y: 87 N: 108 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-01-31 - House - HB 107 PN 59, 2011 A196, MOT GERMANE, DUNBAR (Y: 87 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2011-01-31 - House - HB 107 PN 59, 2011 A198, MOT GERMANE, DUNBAR (Y: 87 N: 108 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2011-02-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-02-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2011-02-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-01-31 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-01-31 | House | Second consideration |
2011-01-25 | House | Removed from table |
2011-01-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-01-25 | House | First consideration |
2011-01-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-01-19 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |