PA HB107 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-16)
Status: Passed on October 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-07 - Act No. 63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-16)
Status: Passed on October 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-07 - Act No. 63
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act repealing the act of June 1, 1915 (P.L.708, No.326), entitled "An act to prevent the wearing of the badge of the Bureau of Police, in cities of the first class, by unauthorized persons, and providing a penalty therefor."
Title
Repealing the act of June 1, 1915 (P.L.708, No.326), entitled "An act to prevent the wearing of the badge of the Bureau of Police, in cities of the first class, by unauthorized persons, and providing a penalty therefor."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-09-27 - Senate - HB 107 PN 100, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - House - HB 107 PN 100, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-06 - House - HB 107 PN 100, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-07 | Act No. 63 | |
2010-10-07 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-09-29 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-09-28 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-09-28 | Signed in House | |
2010-09-27 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-09-22 | Second consideration | |
2010-09-21 | First consideration | |
2010-09-21 | Reported as committed | |
2009-05-12 | Referred to JUDICIARY | |
2009-05-06 | In the Senate | |
2009-05-06 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-05-05 | Second consideration | |
2009-05-05 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-02-04 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-02-04 | Removed from table | |
2009-02-03 | Laid on the table | |
2009-02-03 | First consideration | |
2009-02-03 | Reported as committed | |
2009-01-28 | Referred to JUDICIARY |