PA HB1068 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 18 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-12-07 - Laid on the table
Status: Introduced on April 18 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-12-07 - Laid on the table
Summary
An Act amending Title 44 (Law and Justice) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for Supplement Safe Neighborhoods Program and for powers and duties of Pennsylvania Commission on Crime and Delinquency; establishing the Supplement Safe Neighborhoods Fund; and making an appropriation.
Title
An Act amending Title 44 (Law and Justice) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for Supplement Safe Neighborhoods Program and for powers and duties of Pennsylvania Commission on Crime and Delinquency; establishing the Supplement Safe Neighborhoods Fund; and making an appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-12-07 | Laid on the table | |
2007-12-07 | Removed from table | |
2007-10-29 | Laid on the table | |
2007-10-29 | Removed from table | |
2007-09-25 | Laid on the table | |
2007-09-25 | First consideration | |
2007-09-25 | Reported as committed | |
2007-04-18 | Referred to JUDICIARY |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1068 |