PA HB1064 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-12 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 10 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-06-12 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 11, 1990 (P.L.465, No.113), known as the Tax Increment Financing Act, further providing for definitions, for creation of tax increment districts and approval of project plans and for financing of project costs.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for creation of tax increment districts and approval of project plans and for financing of project costs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1064 PN 3134, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 104 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1064 PN 3134, 2023 A4662, MOTION TO APPEAL RULING OF THE CHAIR (Y: 102 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - House - House Housing And Community Development: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - House - House Housing And Community Development: Adopt Amendment A03809 (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - House Finance: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1064 PN 3134, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 104 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1064 PN 3134, 2023 A4662, MOTION TO APPEAL RULING OF THE CHAIR (Y: 102 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - House - House Housing And Community Development: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - House - House Housing And Community Development: Adopt Amendment A03809 (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - House Finance: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-12 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2024-06-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2024-06-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (104-97) |
2024-06-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2024-06-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-06-04 | House | Second consideration |
2024-06-03 | House | Removed from table |
2024-05-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-05-21 | House | First consideration |
2024-05-21 | House | Reported as amended |
2024-02-22 | House | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 2615 |
2023-05-23 | House | Re-referred to HOUSING AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2023-05-23 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to HOUSING AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2023-04-28 | House | Referred to FINANCE |