PA HB1061 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-10)
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-21 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of December 4, 1996 (P.L.911, No.147), known as the Telemarketer Registration Act, further providing for unwanted telephone solicitation calls prohibited.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for unwanted telephone solicitation calls prohibited.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1061 PN 2580, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A02941 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-21SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2019-11-18SenateIn the Senate
2019-11-18HouseThird consideration and final passage (199-0)
2019-11-18HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-10-30HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-10-30HouseSecond consideration
2019-10-29HouseRemoved from table
2019-09-25HouseLaid on the table
2019-09-25HouseFirst consideration
2019-09-25HouseReported as amended
2019-04-05HouseReferred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1061
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1061&pn=1223
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1061&pn=2580
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=32&theDate=09/25/2019&RollCallId=1128
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=32&theDate=09/25/2019&RollCallId=1129
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=844
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=11/18/2019&RollCallId=1372

Bill Comments

feedback