PA HB1057 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-10)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in State Veterans' Commission and Deputy Adjutant General for Veterans' Affairs, further providing for State Veterans' Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In State Veterans' Commission and Deputy Adjutant General for Veterans' Affairs, further providing for State Veterans' Commission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1057 PN 1091, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-11SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2021-06-09SenateIn the Senate
2021-06-09HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-06-09HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-06-08HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-08HouseSecond consideration
2021-06-07HouseRemoved from table
2021-05-24HouseLaid on the table
2021-05-24HouseFirst consideration
2021-05-24HouseReported as committed
2021-03-31HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback