PA HB1053 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 32-16)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-03 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-03 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for the offense of neglect of care-dependent person; and providing for the offense of abuse of care-dependent person.
Title
Further providing for the offense of neglect of care-dependent person; and providing for the offense of abuse of care-dependent person.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-23 - House - HB 1053 PN 1850, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - HB 1053 PN 1626, 2011 A1664, FARRY (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - HB 1053 PN 1626, 2011 A1664, FARRY (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2011-05-23 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-05-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2011-05-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-05-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-05-10 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2011-05-09 | House | Removed from table |
2011-04-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-04-26 | House | First consideration |
2011-04-26 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-03-14 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |