PA HB1050 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-08 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-08 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 15, 1982 (P.L.1266, No.287), entitled "An act conferring limited residency status on military personnel, their dependents and civilian personnel assigned to an active duty station in Pennsylvania," further providing for residency of students.
Title
Amending the act of December 15, 1982 (P.L.1266, No.287), entitled "An act conferring limited residency status on military personnel, their dependents and civilian personnel assigned to an active duty station in Pennsylvania," further providing for residency of students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1050 PN 1779, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A01241 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended A01241 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1050 PN 1779, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A01241 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended A01241 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-08 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-11-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2019-06-03 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-03 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2019-06-03 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-05-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-15 | House | Second consideration |
2019-05-14 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-08 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-08 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |