PA HB1048 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 68033, carrying State Route 2047 over CSX and SEPTA Railroads, in Middletown Township, Bucks County, as the PFC John Elton Candy Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 68033, carrying State Route 2047 over CSX and SEPTA Railroads, in Middletown Township, Bucks County, as the PFC John Elton Candy Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1048 PN 1084, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2021-06-15SenateIn the Senate
2021-06-15HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2021-06-15HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-06-14HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-14HouseSecond consideration
2021-06-09HouseRemoved from table
2021-05-05HouseLaid on the table
2021-05-05HouseFirst consideration
2021-05-05HouseReported as committed
2021-03-31HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback