PA HB1045 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 74-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 64 (Public Authorities and Quasi-Public Corporations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Commonwealth Financing Authority, further providing for board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Commonwealth Financing Authority, further providing for board.

Sponsors

Rep. Michael Turzai [R]Rep. Bryan Cutler [R]Rep. Kerry Benninghoff [R]Rep. Stanley Saylor [R]
Rep. Marcy Toepel [R]Rep. Donna Oberlander [R]Rep. Kurt Masser [R]Rep. Michael Reese [R]
Rep. Rich Irvin [R]Rep. Clinton Owlett [R]Rep. Francis Ryan [R]Rep. Keith Greiner [R]
Rep. Jeffrey Pyle [R]Rep. Robert James [R]Rep. George Dunbar [R]Rep. Aaron Bernstine [R]
Rep. Melinda Fee [R]Rep. Mark Keller [R]Rep. Karen Boback [R]Rep. Tarah Toohil [R]
Rep. Marcia Hahn [R]Rep. David Millard [R]Rep. Martin Causer [R]Rep. Lori Mizgorski [R]
Rep. Matthew Dowling [R]Rep. Martina White [R]Rep. Paul Schemel [R]Rep. Johnathan Hershey [R]
Rep. Mike Jones [R]Rep. Robert Kauffman [R]Rep. Jesse Topper [R]Rep. Justin Walsh [R]
Rep. Garth Everett [R]Rep. Aaron Kaufer [R]Rep. David Hickernell [R]Rep. Michael Tobash [R]
Rep. Doyle Heffley [R]Rep. Eric Nelson [R]Rep. Seth Grove [R]Rep. Bradley Roae [R]
Rep. Donald Cook [R]Rep. Jerome Knowles [R]Rep. Thomas Sankey [R]Rep. Justin Simmons [R]
Rep. Tedd Nesbit [R]Rep. James Marshall [R]Rep. Jason Ortitay [R]Rep. Barbara Gleim [R]
Rep. Tina Pickett [R]Rep. Rosemary Brown [R]Rep. David Maloney [R]Rep. Wendi Thomas [R]
Rep. James Struzzi [R]Rep. Timothy Hennessey [R]Rep. Barry Jozwiak [R]Rep. Jeff Wheeland [R]
Rep. Steven Mentzer [R]Rep. Joseph Emrick [R]Rep. Andrew Lewis [R]Rep. Lynda Schlegel Culver [R]
Rep. Keith Gillespie [R]Rep. David Zimmerman [R]Rep. Mark Gillen [R]Rep. James Gregory [R]
Rep. Meghan Schroeder [R]Rep. Brett Miller [R]Rep. Ryan Warner [R]Rep. Kathy Rapp [R]
Rep. John Lawrence [R]Rep. Cris Dush [R]Rep. Louis Schmitt [R]Rep. Dan Moul [R]
Rep. Valerie Gaydos [R]Rep. Valerie Gaydos [R]

Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1045 PN 1186, FP (Y: 194 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateReferred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
2019-04-16SenateIn the Senate
2019-04-16HouseThird consideration and final passage (194-3)
2019-04-16HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-04-15HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-15HouseSecond consideration
2019-04-10HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-09HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-09HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-09HouseReported as committed
2019-04-02HouseReferred to APPROPRIATIONS

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback