PA HB1045 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 74-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-13 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-13 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 64 (Public Authorities and Quasi-Public Corporations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Commonwealth Financing Authority, further providing for board.
Title
In Commonwealth Financing Authority, further providing for board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-19 - Senate - Senate Community, Economic And Recreational Development: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1045 PN 1186, FP (Y: 194 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1045 PN 1186, FP (Y: 194 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-04-06 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-11-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2019-04-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-04-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-3) |
2019-04-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-04-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-04-15 | House | Second consideration |
2019-04-10 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-09 | House | First consideration |
2019-04-09 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |