PA HB1040 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-10)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating the bridge, identified as Bridge Key 4133, carrying Pennsylvania Route 913 over Raystown Branch Juniata River in Liberty Township, Bedford County, as the Sergeant Charles Warsing Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating the bridge, identified as Bridge Key 4133, carrying Pennsylvania Route 913 over Raystown Branch Juniata River in Liberty Township, Bedford County, as the Sergeant Charles Warsing Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1040 PN 1076, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1040 PN 1076, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-06-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-06-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2021-06-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-14 | House | Second consideration |
2021-06-09 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-05 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |