PA HB104 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for the assessment of improper payments by Commonwealth agencies and for public information on payments and programs of Commonwealth agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the assessment of improper payments by Commonwealth agencies and for public information on payments and programs of Commonwealth agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Floor: HB 104 PN 245, FP (Y: 182 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Floor: HB 104 PN 74, 2021 A175, GROVE (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-04-27SenateFirst consideration
2021-04-27SenateReported as committed
2021-01-28SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2021-01-27SenateIn the Senate
2021-01-27HouseThird consideration and final passage (182-20)
2021-01-27HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-01-26HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-01-26HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-01-25HouseRemoved from table
2021-01-13HouseLaid on the table
2021-01-13HouseFirst consideration
2021-01-13HouseReported as committed
2021-01-11HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=104
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0104&pn=0074
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0104&pn=0245
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2021&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=0104&pn=0074&aYear=2021&an=00175
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0104P0245.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=01/13/2021&RollCallId=14
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=9
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=18
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=01/27/2021&RollCallId=91
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=04/27/2021&RollCallId=129

Bill Comments

feedback