PA HB1037 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of November 10, 1999 (P.L.491, No.45), known as the Pennsylvania Construction Code Act, in preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions and for application; and, in exemptions, applicability and penalties, further providing for penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, further providing for definitions and for application; and, in exemptions, applicability and penalties, further providing for penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1037 PN 1179, 2019 A1344, GERMANE, LAWRENCE (Y: 85 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2019-05-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1037 PN 1179, 2019 A1274, HANBIDGE (Y: 188 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1037 PN 1179, MOT RECOM L&I, NEILSON (Y: 86 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2019-05-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1037 PN 1179, 2019 A1387, COX (Y: 106 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-05-14HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-14HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-05-13HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-07HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-07HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-07HouseReported as committed
2019-04-02HouseReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1037
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1037&pn=1179
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1037&pn=1836
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=2&theDate=05/07/2019&RollCallId=435
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=317
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=318
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=319
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=320
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/15/2019&RollCallId=572

Bill Comments

feedback