PA HB1037 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 38-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Third consideration and defeated on final passage (91-103)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 20, 2002 (P.L.154, No.13), known as the Medical Care Availability and Reduction of Error (Mcare) Act, in medical professional liability, further providing for punitive damages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In medical professional liability, further providing for punitive damages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1037 PN 3808, FP (Y: 91 N: 103 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1037 PN 1201, 2017 A2605, SNYDER (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1037 PN 1201, 2017 A2655, DIGIROLAMO (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1037 PN 1201, 2017 A2663, FARRY (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1037 PN 1201, 2017 A2657, TOOHIL (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1037 PN 1201, 2017 A2660, BARRAR (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1037 PN 1201, 2017 A3547, GERMANE, KAMPF (Y: 94 N: 96 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1037 PN 1201, 2017 A2806, DIGIROLAMO (Y: 95 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1037 PN 1201, 2017 A6314, MATZIE (Y: 86 N: 104 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1037 PN 1201, 2017 A6313, MATZIE (Y: 83 N: 107 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1037 PN 1201, 2017 A2644, BIZZARRO (Y: 81 N: 107 NV: 4 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1037 PN 1201, 2017 A2605, CUTLER, MOT RECON (Y: 108 N: 85 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1037 PN 1201, 2017 A2638, DAWKINS (Y: 88 N: 105 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1037 PN 1201, 2017 A2623, SCHWEYER (Y: 81 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1037 PN 1201, 2017 A2619, BIZZARRO (Y: 92 N: 99 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1037 PN 1201, 2017 A2609, MULLERY (Y: 85 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1037 PN 1201, 2017 A2608, MULLERY (Y: 84 N: 108 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1037 PN 1201, 2017 A2607, MULLERY (Y: 86 N: 106 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1037 PN 1201, 2017 A2605, SNYDER (Y: 110 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1037 PN 1201, 2017 A2604, BIZZARRO (Y: 87 N: 105 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1037 PN 1201, 2017 A2622, MUSTIO (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1037 PN 1201, 2017 A7533, KAMPF (Y: 113 N: 78 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-09-26 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25HouseThird consideration and defeated on final passage (91-103)
2018-06-25HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-22HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-22HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-06-20HouseRemoved from table
2017-11-27HouseLaid on the table
2017-11-27HouseRemoved from table
2017-09-26HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-26HouseFirst consideration
2017-09-26HouseReported as committed
2017-03-31HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1037
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1037&pn=1201
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1037&pn=3808
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=09/26/2017&RollCallId=916
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1374
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1375
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1376
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1377
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1378
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1379
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1380
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1381
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1382
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1383
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1384
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1385
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1386
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1387
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1392
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1393
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1396
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1397
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1398
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1399
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1400
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/25/2018&RollCallId=1862
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1449

Bill Comments

feedback