PA HB1033 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 31-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for patient access to diagnostics and treatments for Lyme disease and related tick-borne illnesses; and requiring health care policies to provide certain coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for patient access to diagnostics and treatments for Lyme disease and related tick-borne illnesses; and requiring health care policies to provide certain coverage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1033 PN 1064, FP (Y: 136 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1033 PN 1064, 2021 A1154, FRANKEL (Y: 89 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-05 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-07SenateReferred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
2021-06-07SenateIn the Senate
2021-06-07HouseThird consideration and final passage (136-66)
2021-06-07HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-05-26HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-05-26HouseSecond consideration
2021-05-25HouseRemoved from table
2021-05-05HouseLaid on the table
2021-05-05HouseFirst consideration
2021-05-05HouseReported as committed
2021-03-26HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1033
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1033&pn=1064
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB1033P1064.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=05/05/2021&RollCallId=413
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=246
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=272
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/07/2021&RollCallId=551

Bill Comments

feedback