PA HB1033 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Re-committed to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, in licenses and regulations and liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for interlocking business prohibited and for unlawful acts relative to liquor, malt and brewed beverages and licensees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In licenses and regulations and liquor, alcohol and malt and brewed beverages, further providing for interlocking business prohibited and for unlawful acts relative to liquor, malt and brewed beverages and licensees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-28 - Senate - Senate Law And Justice: Reported as Amended (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1033 PN 1702, FP (Y: 103 N: 91 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Liquor Control: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Liquor Control: Adopt Amendment A01072 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-29SenateRe-committed to LAW AND JUSTICE
2017-06-29SenateSecond consideration
2017-06-28SenateFirst consideration
2017-06-28SenateReported as amended
2017-05-31SenateReferred to LAW AND JUSTICE
2017-05-23SenateIn the Senate
2017-05-23HouseThird consideration and final passage (103-91)
2017-05-23HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-05-22HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-05-22HouseSecond consideration
2017-05-10HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-09HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-09HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-09HouseReported as amended
2017-03-30HouseReferred to LIQUOR CONTROL

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1033
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1033&pn=1191
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1033&pn=1702
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1033&pn=2184
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=05/09/2017&RollCallId=366
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=28&theDate=05/09/2017&RollCallId=367
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=371
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/23/2017&RollCallId=442
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=29&theDate=06/28/2017&RollCallId=368

Bill Comments

feedback