PA HB1032 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-07-27 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-07-27 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing the Solar for Schools Grant Program; and providing for powers and duties of the Department of Community and Economic Development.
Title
Establishing the Solar for Schools Grant Program; and providing for powers and duties of the Department of Community and Economic Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1032 PN 1785, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 134 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1032 PN 1041, 2023 A538, MOTION TO TABLE (Y: 102 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1032 PN 1041, 2023 A543 (Y: 101 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1032 PN 1041, 2023 A539 (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1032 PN 1041, 2023 A1002 (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1032 PN 1041, 2023 A542 (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1032 PN 1041, 2023 A1060, MOTION TO APPEAL RULING OF THE CHAIR (Y: 102 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - House Consumer Protection, Technology And Utilities: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1032 PN 1785, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 134 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1032 PN 1041, 2023 A538, MOTION TO TABLE (Y: 102 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1032 PN 1041, 2023 A543 (Y: 101 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1032 PN 1041, 2023 A539 (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1032 PN 1041, 2023 A1002 (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1032 PN 1041, 2023 A542 (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1032 PN 1041, 2023 A1060, MOTION TO APPEAL RULING OF THE CHAIR (Y: 102 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - House Consumer Protection, Technology And Utilities: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-27 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2023-06-29 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-06-29 | House | Third consideration and final passage (134-69) |
2023-06-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-28 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-06-28 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2023-06-07 | House | Removed from table |
2023-05-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-05-23 | House | First consideration |
2023-05-23 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-04-26 | House | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION, TECHNOLOGY AND UTILITIES |