PA HB1031 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act repealing obsolete laws concerning the Scotland School for Veterans' Children.
Title
Repealing obsolete laws concerning the Scotland School for Veterans' Children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1031 PN 1178, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2019-05-01 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-05-01 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2019-05-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-04-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-04-30 | House | Second consideration |
2019-04-29 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-17 | House | First consideration |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |