PA HB103 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-09 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-09 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 65 (Public Officers) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in lobbying disclosure, further providing for prohibited activities and for penalties.
Title
In lobbying disclosure, further providing for prohibited activities and for penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-08 - House - HB 103 PN 56, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - HB 103 PN 56, 2011 A120, MOT GERMANE, CUTLER (Y: 87 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2011-01-31 - House - HB 103 PN 56, 2011 A158, MOT GERMANE, CUTLER (Y: 87 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2011-01-31 - House - HB 103 PN 56, 2011 A157, MOT GERMANE, CUTLER (Y: 85 N: 110 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-01-31 - House - HB 103 PN 56, 2011 A120, MOT GERMANE, CUTLER (Y: 87 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2011-01-31 - House - HB 103 PN 56, 2011 A158, MOT GERMANE, CUTLER (Y: 87 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2011-01-31 - House - HB 103 PN 56, 2011 A157, MOT GERMANE, CUTLER (Y: 85 N: 110 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2011-02-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-02-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2011-02-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-01-31 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-01-31 | House | Second consideration |
2011-01-25 | House | Removed from table |
2011-01-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-01-25 | House | First consideration |
2011-01-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-01-19 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |