PA HB1026 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-07 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-07-07 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in sentencing, providing for sentencing for hate-based intimidation and for community impact statements.
Title
In sentencing, providing for sentencing for hate-based intimidation and for community impact statements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-07-07 - House - House Floor: HB 1026 PN 1359, 2023 A1297 (Y: 102 N: 101 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00569 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A00569 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-07-07 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2023-06-14 | House | Removed from table |
2023-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-05-24 | House | First consideration |
2023-05-24 | House | Reported as amended |
2023-04-25 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |