PA HB1016 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-12)
Status: Engrossed on June 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-24 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in fraternal benefit societies, providing for solvency and further providing for benefit contract and for injunction, liquidation and receivership of domestic society.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In fraternal benefit societies, providing for solvency and further providing for benefit contract and for injunction, liquidation and receivership of domestic society.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-24 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1016 PN 1166, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-24SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-24SenateReported as committed
2019-06-06SenateReferred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
2019-06-04SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-04HouseThird consideration and final passage (196-0)
2019-06-04HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-03HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-03HouseSecond consideration
2019-05-15HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-15HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-15HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-15HouseReported as committed
2019-04-02HouseReferred to INSURANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1016
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1016&pn=1166
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=22&theDate=04/15/2019&RollCallId=267
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=352
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/04/2019&RollCallId=610
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=37&theDate=06/24/2019&RollCallId=384

Bill Comments

feedback