PA HB1013 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-6)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-19 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, further providing for Keystone Exams and graduation requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In preliminary provisions, further providing for Keystone Exams and graduation requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1013 PN 1052, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-19SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2021-06-25SenateSecond consideration
2021-06-22SenateFirst consideration
2021-06-22SenateReported as committed
2021-05-25SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2021-05-24SenateIn the Senate
2021-05-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-05-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-05-05HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-05-05HouseSecond consideration
2021-05-04HouseRemoved from table
2021-04-19HouseLaid on the table
2021-04-19HouseFirst consideration
2021-04-19HouseReported as committed
2021-03-25HouseReferred to EDUCATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1013
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1013&pn=1052
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB1013P1052.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=12&theDate=04/19/2021&RollCallId=293
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=222
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/24/2021&RollCallId=441
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=23&theDate=06/22/2021&RollCallId=395

Bill Comments

feedback