PA HB1013 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-7)
Status: Enrolled on October 17 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-10-17 - Presented to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, in quality health care accountability and protection, further providing for emergency services and providing for quality eye care for insured Pennsylvanians.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In quality health care accountability and protection, further providing for emergency services and providing for quality eye care for insured Pennsylvanians.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1013 PN 4069, CONCUR (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-10-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1013 PN 4069, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-25 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1013 PN 1709, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A01180 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended A01180 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-17HousePresented to the Governor
2018-10-17HouseSigned in Senate
2018-10-17HouseSigned in House
2018-10-17HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (187-0)
2018-10-17HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2018-10-17HouseReferred to RULES
2018-10-16HouseIn the House
2018-10-16SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-10-15SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-09-26SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-09-26SenateSecond consideration
2018-09-25SenateFirst consideration
2018-09-25SenateReported as amended
2017-05-31SenateReferred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
2017-05-24SenateIn the Senate
2017-05-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (190-0)
2017-05-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-05-23HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-05-23HouseSecond consideration
2017-05-22HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-10HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-10HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-10HouseReported as amended
2017-03-28HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1013
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1013&pn=1172
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1013&pn=1709
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1013&pn=4069
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=05/10/2017&RollCallId=398
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=05/10/2017&RollCallId=396
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/24/2017&RollCallId=455
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=388
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=37&theDate=09/25/2018&RollCallId=1091
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=10/15/2018&RollCallId=1203
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=697
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1592

Bill Comments

feedback