PA HB1010 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, further providing for proposal of amendments by the General Assembly and their adoption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, further providing for proposal of amendments by the General Assembly and their adoption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1010 PN 1453, FP (Y: 113 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1010 PN 1373, 2021 A890, SOLOMON (Y: 90 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1010 PN 1373, 2021 A922, B. MILLER (Y: 121 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-25SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2021-05-24SenateIn the Senate
2021-05-24HouseThird consideration and final passage (113-88)
2021-05-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-05-05HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-05-05HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-05-04HouseRemoved from table
2021-05-03HouseLaid on the table
2021-05-03HouseFirst consideration
2021-05-03HouseReported as committed
2021-04-27HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1010
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1010&pn=1373
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1010&pn=1453
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB1010P1453.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=05/03/2021&RollCallId=359
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=191
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=192
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=223
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/24/2021&RollCallId=440

Bill Comments 750

feedback