PA HB101 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 48-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for limited civil liability for agritourism activity providers, for notice of limited civil liability and for acknowledgment of limited civil liability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for limited civil liability for agritourism activity providers, for notice of limited civil liability and for acknowledgment of limited civil liability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-25 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 101 PN 1008, CONCUR (Y: 147 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 101 PN 1008, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - House - House Floor: HB 101 PN 71, FP (Y: 142 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30HouseAct No. 27
2021-06-30HouseApproved by the Governor
2021-06-28HousePresented to the Governor
2021-06-25HouseSigned in Senate
2021-06-25HouseSigned in House
2021-06-25HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (147-54)
2021-06-25HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2021-06-24HouseReferred to RULES
2021-06-24HouseIn the House
2021-06-24SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-2)
2021-06-21SenateRemoved from table
2021-06-21SenateLaid on the table
2021-05-24SenateRemoved from table
2021-05-24SenateLaid on the table
2021-03-24SenateSecond consideration
2021-03-23SenateFirst consideration
2021-03-23SenateReported as amended
2021-02-05SenateReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
2021-02-05SenateIn the Senate
2021-02-05HouseThird consideration and final passage (142-60)
2021-02-05HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-02-04HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-02-04HouseSecond consideration
2021-02-03HouseRemoved from table
2021-01-27HouseLaid on the table
2021-01-27HouseFirst consideration
2021-01-27HouseReported as committed
2021-01-11HouseReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=101
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0101&pn=0071
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0101&pn=1008
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0101P0071.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0101P1008.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=2&theDate=01/27/2021&RollCallId=34
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=33
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/05/2021&RollCallId=104
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=27&theDate=03/23/2021&RollCallId=63
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=210
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=442
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/25/2021&RollCallId=782

Bill Comments

feedback