PA HB1009 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on December 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-21 - Act No. 63
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act authorizing the release of Project 70 restrictions on certain land owned by the Borough of West Newton, Westmoreland County, in return for the development of park and open space lands within the Borough of West Newton, Westmoreland County; and authorizing the release of Project 70 restrictions on certain lands owned by Upper Uwchlan Township, Chester County, in exchange for the provision of money for the purchase and installation of recreational equipment and the implementation of a multiuse trail.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the release of Project 70 restrictions on certain land owned by the Borough of West Newton, Westmoreland County, in return for the development of park and open space lands within the Borough of West Newton, Westmoreland County; and authorizing the release of Project 70 restrictions on certain lands owned by Upper Uwchlan Township, Chester County, in exchange for the provision of money for the purchase and installation of recreational equipment and the implementation of a multiuse trail.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-05 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1009 PN 2697, CONCUR (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-11-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1009 PN 2697, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-13 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1009 PN 1168, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-09-26 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-21HouseAct No. 63
2017-12-21HouseApproved by the Governor
2017-12-11HousePresented to the Governor
2017-12-11HouseSigned in Senate
2017-12-05HouseSigned in House
2017-12-05HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (187-0)
2017-12-05HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2017-11-20HouseReferred to RULES
2017-11-15HouseIn the House
2017-11-15SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2017-11-14SenateSecond consideration
2017-11-13SenateFirst consideration
2017-11-13SenateReported as amended
2017-11-01SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2017-10-16SenateIn the Senate
2017-10-16HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-0)
2017-10-16HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-10-03HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-10-03HouseSecond consideration
2017-10-02HouseRemoved from table
2017-09-26HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-26HouseFirst consideration
2017-09-26HouseReported as committed
2017-03-28HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1009
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1009&pn=1168
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1009&pn=2697
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=09/26/2017&RollCallId=910
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=743
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/16/2017&RollCallId=999
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=11/13/2017&RollCallId=538
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=347
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=880
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=12/05/2017&RollCallId=1107

Bill Comments

feedback