PA HB1006 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In personal income tax, further providing for classes of income.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1006 PN 1827, FP (Y: 201 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1006 PN 1038, 2021 A1571, METZGAR (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A01483 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-17SenateReferred to FINANCE
2021-06-16SenateIn the Senate
2021-06-16HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-1)
2021-06-16HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-06-15HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-15HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-06-15HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-06-09HouseRe-committed to RULES
2021-06-09HouseFirst consideration
2021-06-09HouseReported as committed
2021-03-24HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1006
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1006&pn=1038
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1006&pn=1827
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB1006P1827.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=06/09/2021&RollCallId=585
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=16&theDate=06/09/2021&RollCallId=587
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=334
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/15/2021&RollCallId=631
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=360
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/16/2021&RollCallId=687

Bill Comments

feedback