PA HB1003 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of August 11, 1967 (P.L.205, No.69), entitled "An act to validate conveyances and other instruments which have been defectively acknowledged," extending the date for validation of certain conveyances and other instruments.
Title
Amending the act of August 11, 1967 (P.L.205, No.69), entitled "An act to validate conveyances and other instruments which have been defectively acknowledged," extending the date for validation of certain conveyances and other instruments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1003 PN 1036, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1003 PN 1036, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-02-09 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2021-06-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-06-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2021-06-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-23 | House | Second consideration |
2021-06-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-15 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-15 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |