PA HB1001 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-12 - Act No. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act regulating milk banks that provide donor human milk in this Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulating milk banks that provide donor human milk in this Commonwealth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1001 PN 3258, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1001 PN 3258, CONCUR (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1001 PN 1126, FP (Y: 191 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-12HouseAct No. 7
2020-02-12HouseApproved by the Governor
2020-02-06HousePresented to the Governor
2020-02-05HouseSigned in Senate
2020-02-04HouseSigned in House
2020-02-04HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (192-0)
2020-02-04HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-02-04HouseReferred to RULES
2020-02-04HouseIn the House
2020-02-04SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2020-02-03SenateAmended on third consideration
2020-01-28SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-11-19SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-11-19SenateSecond consideration
2019-11-18SenateFirst consideration
2019-11-18SenateReported as amended
2019-06-06SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2019-06-03SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-03HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-1)
2019-06-03HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-05-01HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-01HouseSecond consideration
2019-04-30HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-29HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-29HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-29HouseReported as committed
2019-03-27HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1001
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1001&pn=1126
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1001&pn=2884
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1001&pn=3258
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=04/29/2019&RollCallId=357
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=336
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/03/2019&RollCallId=581
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=11/18/2019&RollCallId=650
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=01/28/2020&RollCallId=724
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1113
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=402
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=02/04/2020&RollCallId=1727

Bill Comments

feedback