PA HB1001 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act regulating home inspectors; establishing the Home Inspection Licensing Board; providing for licensure and practice, for disciplinary action, for remedies and for penalties; making an appropriation; and repealing provisions relating to home inspections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulating home inspectors; establishing the Home Inspection Licensing Board; providing for licensure and practice, for disciplinary action, for remedies and for penalties; making an appropriation; and repealing provisions relating to home inspections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1001 PN 2587, FP (Y: 125 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02647 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A02032 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-04SenateSecond consideration
2018-05-23SenateRemoved from table
2018-05-23SenateLaid on the table
2018-03-26SenateRemoved from table
2018-03-26SenateLaid on the table
2018-01-23SenateFirst consideration
2018-01-23SenateReported as committed
2017-11-01SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2017-10-17SenateIn the Senate
2017-10-17HouseThird consideration and final passage (125-63)
2017-10-16HouseRe-reported as amended
2017-06-29HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-06-29HouseSecond consideration
2017-06-27HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-06-21HouseRe-committed to RULES
2017-06-21HouseFirst consideration
2017-06-21HouseReported as amended
2017-03-28HouseReferred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1001
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1001&pn=1161
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1001&pn=2093
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1001&pn=2587
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=06/21/2017&RollCallId=688
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=06/21/2017&RollCallId=689
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/27/2017&RollCallId=772
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/16/2017&RollCallId=998
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/16/2017&RollCallId=997
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=756
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=13&theDate=01/23/2018&RollCallId=612

Bill Comments

feedback