PA HB1001 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act regulating home inspectors; establishing the Home Inspection Licensing Board; providing for licensure and practice, for disciplinary action, for remedies and for penalties; making an appropriation; and repealing provisions relating to home inspections.
Title
Regulating home inspectors; establishing the Home Inspection Licensing Board; providing for licensure and practice, for disciplinary action, for remedies and for penalties; making an appropriation; and repealing provisions relating to home inspections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1001 PN 2587, FP (Y: 125 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02647 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A02032 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1001 PN 2587, FP (Y: 125 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02647 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-10-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A02032 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Removed from table |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2018-01-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2017-11-01 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2017-10-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2017-10-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (125-63) |
2017-10-16 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2017-06-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2017-06-29 | House | Second consideration |
2017-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2017-06-21 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2017-06-21 | House | First consideration |
2017-06-21 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-03-28 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |