PA HB100 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-21)
Status: Engrossed on October 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-10-26 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 22, 1951 (P.L.317, No.69), known as The Professional Nursing Law, providing for Certified Registered Nurse Practitioner Pilot Program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for Certified Registered Nurse Practitioner Pilot Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-20 - House - House Floor: HB 100 PN 4452, FP (Y: 201 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-29 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A07388 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-26SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2020-10-20SenateIn the Senate
2020-10-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-1)
2020-10-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-10-19HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-10-19HouseSecond consideration
2020-09-30HouseRemoved from table
2020-09-29HouseLaid on the table
2020-09-29HouseFirst consideration
2020-09-29HouseReported as amended
2019-04-15HouseReferred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=100
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0100&pn=1402
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0100&pn=4452
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=09/29/2020&RollCallId=2510
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=34&theDate=09/29/2020&RollCallId=2511
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1682
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/20/2020&RollCallId=2598

Bill Comments

feedback