OR SJR47 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-23 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-23 - Filed With Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Raymond Moles by directing creation of Raymond Moles Memorial Wildlife Safety Corridor along U.S. Highway 26.
Title
Honoring Raymond Moles by directing creation of Raymond Moles Memorial Wildlife Safety Corridor along U.S. Highway 26.
Sponsors
Sen. Jason Atkinson [R] | Sen. Brian Boquist [R] | Sen. Ted Ferrioli [R] | Sen. Fred Girod [R] |
Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] | Sen. Franklin Morse [R] | Sen. Douglas Whitsett [R] | Sen. Jackie Winters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-23 | Filed With Secretary of State. | |
2010-02-23 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-22 | President signed. | |
2010-02-19 | Read. Carried by Bentz. Adopted. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Berger, Weidner. | |
2010-02-17 | Recommendation: Be adopted. | |
2010-02-17 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-16 | Referred to Transportation. | |
2010-02-16 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. | |
2010-02-15 | Final reading. Carried by Ferrioli. Adopted. Ayes, 30. | |
2010-02-12 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-11 | Recommendation: Do adopt with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2010-02-10 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Business and Transportation. | |
2010-02-01 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |