OR SJR46 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment to Oregon Constitution to require that proposed elector enactments requiring expenditure of public moneys include proposed source of revenue sufficient to pay for expenditure. Specifies that proposed source of revenue may not draw from existing revenues or from projected revenues of existing source. Allows Legislative Assembly to limit expenditure to amount supplied by source of revenue. Refers proposed amendment to people for their approval or rejection at next regular general election.
Title
Proposing amendment to Oregon Constitution relating to revenue sources for expenditures of public moneys in ballot measures.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Knopp [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Work Session cancelled. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Possible Work Session cancelled. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SJR46 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SJR46/Introduced |